+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-1)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 114564/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
114564/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2018: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 27, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 16, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 15, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor