+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (92-40)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {492717/1 Report Adopted
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
492717/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 21, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 40
February 18, 2013: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor