+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
- Text - Chapter - Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Finance
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
- Text - Third - Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues
- Favorable with Amendments {973623/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
On October 5, 2021 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 21-301 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (3)
April 6, 2022: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 18, 2022: Third Reading Passed (130-0)
- Yeas: 130
January 19, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor