+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
March 12, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor