+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (94-44)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (39-6)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 188172/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (91-45)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment 273221/2 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted
- Special Order until later this session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 530610/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2018: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 3, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 44
April 3, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 6
March 19, 2018: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor