+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-1)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (119-19)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Special Order until 03/27 (Delegate Barron) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 825467/1 Report Adopted
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
825467/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 6-309 - Article - Economic Development
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
March 25, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 20, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 119
- Nays: 19
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor