+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 91
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-1)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-102, 12-2004, 12-2005, 12-905 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-1)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
March 4, 2020: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Yeas: 136
February 24, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
February 3, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor