+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 5:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 9, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor