+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 30, 2017: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
February 17, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
February 14, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor