+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
- Rereferred to Finance
- Favorable Report by Finance
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 8, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 8, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
April 3, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsors (140)
Type:
Primary Sponsor