+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {987675/1 Report Adopted
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {154367/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-604 - Article - Economic Development
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 5, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
April 3, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor