+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
- Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted (33-13)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {709530/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {486381/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-317 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 1, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 28, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor