+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments 775066/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
775066/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 28, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
February 25, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor