+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (94-35)
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-315 - Article - Election Law
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2020: Third Reading Passed (94-35)
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 35
February 25, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor