+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (126-0)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {355761/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendment
355761/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-516 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 31, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 18, 2017: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 16, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 126
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor