+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (126-10)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-309 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Vote
April 9, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor