+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On March 15, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (128-5)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {664264/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-1, 16-2A - Article - Baltimore City
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2020: Third Reading Passed (128-5)
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 5
February 10, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor