+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {260013/1 Report Adopted
On March 17, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
260013/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 22-218 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2018: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 15, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137