+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 795
On April 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 317372/1 Report Adopted
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-1)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 623892/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 1, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 30, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
March 14, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor