+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-1605 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 28, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 24, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
February 21, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor