+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (32-13)
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (93-47)
- Third Reading Passed (87-53)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Long) Rejected (48-87)
- Floor Amendment 433220/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected (48-87)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 213698/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-507.2 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (7)
April 6, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 2, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 13
March 23, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 20, 2018: House Floor - Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 47
March 20, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 53
March 19, 2018: House Floor - Motion Special Order Until 3/27 (Delegate Long) Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 87
March 19, 2018: House Floor - Floor Amendment {433220/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 87
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor