+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/09 at 12:30 p.m.
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {996581/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendment
996581/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 14-103 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 5, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 31, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor