+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {932310/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendment
932310/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 13, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor