+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
- Conference Committee Report {453928/1
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-3)
- Conference Committee Report {453928/1 Adopted
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and Sydnor)
- Senate Refuses Recede
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and Sydnor)
- Senate Refuses Recede
- House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Bartlett and Crutchfield)
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Bartlett and Crutchfield)
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {153422/1 Adopted
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (125-6)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
- First Reading Judiciary
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On August 11, 2021 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-318 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (131-3)
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 3
April 6, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 17, 2022: Third Reading Passed (125-6)
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 6
February 14, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
January 7, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor