+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (84-53)
On March 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {752115/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
752115/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-209 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2018: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 14, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 53
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor