+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted
- Favorable
- Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Favorable
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (124-6)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {205660/1 Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendment
205660/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 31, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 26, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 6