+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted (27-20)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {133226/1 Withdrawn
- Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {373525/1 Rejected (21-26)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {543529/1 Rejected (20-27)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) {283227/1 Rejected (16-29)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {863322/1 Rejected (17-30)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {283724/1 Rejected (19-27)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {163122/1 Rejected (14-32)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {803627/1 Rejected (13-33)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {303627/1 Rejected (17-28)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {913427/1 Rejected (21-26)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {893029/1 Withdrawn
- Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {403128/1 Rejected (19-28)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {533726/1 Rejected (20-25)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {153123/1 Rejected (18-28)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {763321/1 Rejected (20-27)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {653222/1 Withdrawn
- Second Reading Passed
- Third Reading Passed (27-20)
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (76-63)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Haddaway-Riccio) {653927/1 Rejected (50-81)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Bohanan) {303022/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Guzzone) {503328/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Mitchell) {773128/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {453327/1 Rejected (50-84)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Aumann) {963129/1 Rejected (46-90)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Olszewski) {113926/1 Rejected (61-73)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Schuh) {453325/1 Rejected (46-82)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {183026/1 Rejected (56-78)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {813325/1 Rejected (3-124)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Bates) {443028/1 Rejected (43-85)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/20 (Turner F) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {415364/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendments (28)
813325/01
Rejected
963129/01
Rejected
453327/01
Rejected
453325/01
Rejected
503328/01
Adopted
653927/01
Rejected
773128/01
Adopted
415364/01
Adopted
443028/01
Rejected
303022/01
Adopted
113926/01
Rejected
183026/01
Rejected
893029/01
Withdrawn
913427/01
Rejected
863322/01
Rejected
803627/01
Rejected
763321/01
Rejected
543529/01
Rejected
533726/01
Rejected
653222/01
Withdrawn
403128/01
Rejected
373525/01
Rejected
303627/01
Rejected
283724/01
Rejected
163122/01
Rejected
283227/01
Rejected
153123/01
Rejected
133226/01
Withdrawn
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 2-1103 - Article - Tax - General
- 2-1303 - Article - Tax - General
- 9-305 - Article - Tax - General
- 13-954 - Article - Transportation
- 3-202 - Article - Transportation
- 3-215 - Article - Transportation
- 3-216 - Article - Transportation
- 3-217 - Article - Transportation
- 7-208 - Article - Transportation
- 7-506 - Article - Transportation
- 2-1302.2 - Article - Tax - General
- 9-306 - Article - Tax - General
- 8-613.3 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (26)
March 29, 2013: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 26, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 20
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {913427/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 26
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Glassman) {543529/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 27
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jacobs) {283227/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 29
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jennings) {153123/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 28
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {373525/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 26
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {163122/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 32
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {283724/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 27
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {303627/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 28
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {533726/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 25
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {763321/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 27
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {803627/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 33
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 20
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {403128/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 28
March 25, 2013: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Getty) {863322/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 30
March 19, 2013: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 19, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 63
March 17, 2013: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {183026/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 78
March 17, 2013: House Floor - Floor Amendment (McMillan) {453327/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 84
March 17, 2013: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Olszewski) {113926/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 73
March 17, 2013: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Schuh) {453325/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 82
March 17, 2013: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Bates) {443028/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 85
March 17, 2013: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {813325/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 124
March 17, 2013: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Aumann) {963129/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 90
March 17, 2013: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Haddaway) {653927/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 81
+ − Sponsor
Speaker
Type:
Primary Sponsor