+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 103792/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
103792/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-804 - Article - Commercial Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 14, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor