+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-1)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-1)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {782219/1 Report Adopted
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
782219/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-8A-10.1 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 22, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
March 6, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 1
March 3, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor