+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (119-18)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {133898/1 Report Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {673922/1 Rejected (49-87)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 29, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 25, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 119
- Nays: 18
March 24, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {673922/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 87
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor