+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Creating Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Creating Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (101-38)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (30-14)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {594735/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (102-31)
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
- First Reading Appropriations
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
On October 9, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-3301 through 9-3304 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (101-38)
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 38
April 10, 2021: Third Reading Passed (30-14)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 14
March 19, 2021: Third Reading Passed (102-31)
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 31
March 18, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
January 11, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor