+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (100-39)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {423396/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
423396/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-1102 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 28, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 17, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 39
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor