+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (113-23)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {244964/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
244964/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-310 - Article - Human Services
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 23
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor