+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {456586/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Reassigned to Health and Government Operations
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
456586/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor