+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments 560514/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
560514/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-114 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
February 22, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
February 18, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor