+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {734930/1 Report Adopted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Committee Amendment {743296/1 Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {293191/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-202.2 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
April 1, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 7, 2013: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor