+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {110613/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
110613/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2017: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 20, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 17, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139