+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted (84-51)
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {487771/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {273623/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {463624/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-34)
- Floor Amendment {903320/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates Rosenberg, Pena-Melnyk, and Kipke
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
- House Requests Senate Recede
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (90-45)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {733626/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (47-86)
- Floor Amendment {823723/1 (Delegate B. Wilson) Rejected (53-78)
- Floor Amendment {343520/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (51-82)
- Floor Amendment {433129/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (46-84)
- Floor Amendment {913725/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (46-86)
- Floor Amendment {113221/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {583529/1 (Delegate Glenn) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {133720/1 (Delegate Glenn) Adopted
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Special Order until 04/03 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {766389/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (13)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 13-3301 through 13-3316 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3301 through 13-3318 - Article - Health - General
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
- 13-3302 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3303 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3305 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3306 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3307 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3308 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3309 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3310 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3316 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (11)
April 10, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 5, 2017: House Floor - Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 51
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 13
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {463624/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 34
March 31, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 28, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 45
March 27, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {913725/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 86
March 27, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {823723/1 (Delegate B. Wilson) Rejected
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 78
March 27, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {733626/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 86
March 27, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {433129/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 84
March 27, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {343520/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 82
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor