+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 791
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-0)
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to Finance
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 784966/1 Report Adopted
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
784966/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 2, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 43
March 12, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 12, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor