+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {976988/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
976988/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 18, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor