+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (128-10)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statute Amended
- 27-608 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 26, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor