+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (99-35)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {770819/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Land Use - Development - Middle Housing (Modest Home Choices Act of 2020)
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-114 - Article - Land Use
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2020: Third Reading Passed (99-35)
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 35
February 10, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor