+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 743
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (109-28)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable with Amendments 789232/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (106-29)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
- Favorable with Amendments 754767/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 1, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 28
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
March 14, 2019: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor