+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (93-42)
- Passed Enrolled
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {429531/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable with Amendments {429531/1
- Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (90-46)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
- Favorable with Amendments {895064/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-1101 through 8-1107 - Article - Human Services
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 26, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 42
March 26, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 13
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor