+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge - Foundation for Applied Construction Technology for Students PG 413-20
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 466
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge - Foundation for Applied Construction Technology for Students PG 413-20
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge - Foundation for Applied Construction Technology for Students PG 413-20
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-192.01 - Article - Prince George's County
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 14, 2020: Third Reading Passed (131-0)
- Yeas: 131
March 12, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
February 11, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor