+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn by Sponsor
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing canceled
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Prince George’s County – National Center for Victims of Crime – Funding
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-1011 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Vote
March 11, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor