+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (85-50)
- Passed Enrolled
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-13)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {899137/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable with Amendments {899137/1
- Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (87-50)
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Favorable with Amendments {980617/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 26, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 50
March 26, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 13
March 19, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor