+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (126-12)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {929739/2 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (122-13)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
929739/02
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-501 - Article - Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 9, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 126
- Nays: 12
April 7, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46