+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {615169/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendment
615169/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-128 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 20, 2013: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 18, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor