+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-304 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 28, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 21, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132